Accounts and annual returns THE LONDON SCHOOL OF ARCHITECTURE

Charity number: 1159927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 04 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 04 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 02 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 02 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 June 2019 20 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 June 2019 20 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window