ASHOK TREE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 13 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 13 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 June 2019 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 15 June 2019 46 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 29 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 29 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 25 May 2017 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 11 April 2017 On time Download