ASHOK TREE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £17.96k £59.57k £26.09k £15.00k £18.93k
Total expenditure £12.66k £36.03k £32.94k £23.95k £24.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A