Financial history ST JOSEPH'S FRIENDS

Charity number: 1158682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2017 01/09/2018 01/09/2019 01/09/2020 01/09/2021
Total gross income £203 £1.60k £22.80k £8.99k £1.21k
Total expenditure £187 £357 £17.97k £2.71k £8.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A