MALMESBURY AND DISTRICT FOODBANK

Charity number: 1157896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.17k £6.74k £7.41k £19.17k £60.80k
Total expenditure £4.91k £6.17k £9.46k £13.08k £18.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A