MALMESBURY AND DISTRICT FOODBANK

Charity number: 1157896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stella Louise Krajewski Trustee 11 January 2021 None on record
JOHN RICHARD PAYLER Trustee 08 February 2021 None on record
Nicholas Pascoe Trustee 10 February 2020 None on record
MR RAY SANDERSON CERT ED, DOTADI Chair 08 February 2021
MALMESBURY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY TRANSPORT Received: On time
Dr RICHARD GRAY Trustee 11 November 2019
MALMESBURY AND DISTRICT U3A Received: On time
MICHAEL DAVID LANGTREE Trustee 11 November 2019
WILTSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY Received: On time
Nicola Ann Templeton Trustee 11 October 2021 None on record
Heather Chivers Trustee 11 October 2021 None on record
Frances Mancktelow Trustee 11 October 2021 None on record