Accounts and annual returns WOMEN SEEKING SANCTUARY ADVOCACY GROUP WALES

Charity number: 1165259
Charity reporting is overdue by 440 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 75 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 75 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 440 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 440 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 June 2021 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 June 2021 148 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window