ST. JOHN'S PRE-SCHOOL MACCLESFIELD

Charity number: 1157982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 September 2020 23 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2020 23 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 15 September 2019 14 August 2020 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2019 14 August 2020 30 days late Download
Annual return 15 September 2018 21 February 2020 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2018 21 February 2020 221 days late Download
Annual return 15 September 2017 13 November 2018 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2017 13 November 2018 121 days late Download
Annual return 15 September 2016 13 November 2018 486 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2016 13 November 2018 486 days late Download