RYCROFT LEISURE

Charity number: 1157830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 January 2017 On time Download