RYCROFT LEISURE

Charity number: 1157830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £128.95k £195.37k £181.14k £235.36k £240.11k
Total expenditure £100.40k £128.60k £143.14k £229.72k £231.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £49.89k N/A