THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ANDREW, RUGBY

Charity number: 1160223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 December 2019 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 December 2019 49 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 25 April 2016 On time Download