THE HANNA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1159761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 17 November 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 17 November 2021 22 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 17 November 2020 13 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 17 November 2020 13 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 17 November 2019 22 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 17 November 2019 22 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 17 November 2018 01 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 17 November 2018 01 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 17 November 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 17 November 2017 30 November 2017 On time Download