THE HANNA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1159761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 17/11/2017 17/11/2018 17/11/2019 17/11/2020 17/11/2021
Total gross income £600 £1.35k £1.35k £1.95k £100
Total expenditure £2.00k £1.35k £1.35k £1.77k £178
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A