DISCIPLESHIP CHURCH OF GOD (PENTECOSTAL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES THE GENERAL PUBLIC/MANKIND PROVIDES ADVOCACY/ADVICE/ INFORMATION (QUARTERLY LUNCH CLUB - currently suspended due to COVID -19), TELEPHONE WEEKLY WELL-BEING CHECKS , ESSENTIAL FOOD DELIVERY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
Governance
- 05 August 2014: CIO registration
- DISCIPLESHIP CHURCH OF GOD(PENTECOSTAL) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOY MILLICENT SMITH | Chair | 27 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Zelmarine Tindale | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Simpson-Lewis | Trustee | 10 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Tobias-Davis | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MOUREEN GORDON | Trustee | 27 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.65k | £10.62k | £7.43k | £10.88k | £17.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.85k | £9.67k | £10.98k | £11.19k | £16.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 9
Melcombe House
Dorset Road
London
SW8 1ES
- Phone:
- 07932311243
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window