KETTON SPORTS AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1159624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR CHARLIE UNDERWOOD Trustee 10 December 2015 None on record
Jenny Rogers Trustee 10 August 2018 None on record
Cristian Durant Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Dr ANDREW NEIL MCGILVRAY Chair 25 September 2014 None on record
James Farrell Trustee 20 July 2020 None on record
GLENIS SOUTHERN Trustee 10 August 2018
THE TOWN ESTATE (OTHERWISE THE TOWN LAND AND WHITEBREAD ALLOTMENT) KNOWN LOCALLY AS THE WHITEBREAD CHARITY Received: On time
ADRIAN PEARCE Trustee 10 December 2015 None on record
RONALD EDWARD TILLEY Trustee 10 December 2015 None on record
Matt Holdup Trustee 20 July 2020 None on record
JAYNE MICHELLE WHEELER MAAT Trustee 10 December 2015
WELLAND DIVISION GUIDE ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Jacob Daniel Miller Trustee 07 September 2020 None on record
Graham John Bedford Trustee 20 January 2020 None on record
Ian Loader Trustee 10 August 2018 None on record