ASPIRE RYDE

Charity number: 1163336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £110.45k £141.53k £127.18k £232.81k £276.25k
Total expenditure £96.70k £118.91k £150.25k £189.35k £223.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £35.00k £129.63k