ASPIRE RYDE

Charity number: 1163336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Gardner Trustee 19 September 2019 None on record
MR NICK MULHERN Trustee 01 October 2014 None on record
The Venerable Peter Leonard Trustee 03 February 2020
ROBERT URRY'S GIFT Received: On time
WORSLEY'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY Received: On time
HOLLIS CHARITY Received: On time
PORTSMOUTH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
THE BROADLANDS FUND Received: On time
THE UPPER ALMSHOUSES Received: On time
ROBERT WHITE Trustee 05 December 2016
THE OXFORDSHIRE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY TRUST Received: On time
Beverley Jessup Trustee 21 January 2019 None on record
LARA SUSSMAN Trustee 04 February 2014 None on record
Nick England Trustee 03 February 2020 None on record
IAN PRATT Trustee 12 March 2018
FRONTLINE ADVICE CENTRE Received: On time
WINFORD CHURCH TRUST Received: On time
MIKE DRINKWATER Trustee 16 July 2018 None on record