Trustees Coetir Anian

Charity number: 1158185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAT MITCHELL Chair 08 August 2014
None on record
Jonathan Walker Trustee 15 February 2021
None on record
Wendy Elizabeth Joss Trustee 10 August 2020
None on record
Dr Joseph Cornelius Ellis Hope Trustee 18 November 2019
None on record
Kara Moses BSc Trustee 17 September 2017
None on record
PETER TAYLOR BSc Trustee 14 September 2014
None on record
Nicola Hart Trustee 14 September 2014
None on record
Dr Sophie Wynne-Jones BSc, PhD Trustee 09 September 2014
None on record
Nicola Charlesworth Trustee 08 August 2014
CYMDEITHAS RHIENI AC ATHRAWON YSGOL PENLLWYN PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Overdue by 1518 days