COMMUNITY OF TIGRAYAN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1158762
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Netsanet Gebru Trustee 07 February 2020 None on record
SIMON HAYELOM Trustee 27 January 2019 None on record
BERHANE GEBRU Trustee 15 November 2015 None on record
HABTOM ZERU Trustee 27 January 2019 None on record
HASSAN ROBLE Trustee 27 January 2019 None on record
Mulat Haregot Trustee 18 May 2015
SOBUS Charity reporting is up to date
ISLINGTON BAMER ADVICE ALLIANCE (IBAA) Recently registered
H&F BME Charity reporting is up to date
Abraham Mebrahtu Trustee 07 February 2020 None on record
HENOKE DANIEL Trustee 19 January 2018
THE EVELYN OLDFIELD UNIT Charity reporting is up to date
Yalemzewed Abraha Trustee 07 February 2020 None on record
HIWOT ROBINS Trustee 19 January 2018 None on record