GET UP AND GO GLOUCESTER

Charity number: 1159640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.29k £12.61k £445 £12.00k £0
Total expenditure £4.13k £18.18k £314 £12.45k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.60k £1.30k £445 £7.00k N/A