Accounts and annual returns LONDON INTERNATIONAL MODEL UNITED NATIONS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1159324
Charity reporting is up to date (178 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 25 September 2023 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 25 September 2023 178 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 28 July 2023 484 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 28 July 2023 484 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 23 July 2022 479 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 23 July 2022 479 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 30 November 2020 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 30 November 2020 244 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 20 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 20 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window