Financial history LONDON INTERNATIONAL MODEL UNITED NATIONS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1159324
Charity reporting is up to date (178 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £136.24k £99.09k £99.09k £11.14k £71.07k
Total expenditure £121.84k £107.95k £107.97k £7.13k £76.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A