Trustees LONDON INTERNATIONAL MODEL UNITED NATIONS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1159324
Charity reporting is overdue by 185 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Afolabi Adekaiyaoja Chair 28 April 2018
None on record
George Mullens Trustee 11 July 2022
None on record
Fariha Baba Trustee 14 March 2022
None on record
Nudhara Yusuf Trustee 08 July 2021
None on record
Moni Owoade Trustee 18 January 2020
THE WILBERFORCE SOCIETY
Received: 20 days late
Muqaddam Malik Trustee 18 January 2020
None on record
Meshaal Choudhary Trustee 18 January 2020
None on record
DENISE CHAU Trustee 24 November 2014
None on record