THE WOODPLUMPTON AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY CLUB

Charity number: 505008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £22.95k £19.95k £21.38k £19.58k £20.10k
Total expenditure £26.88k £22.95k £14.18k £21.38k £10.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k