DAI REES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Dai Rees Foundation (DRF) is a charitable organisation made up of UK based registered Paramedics. Our aim is to provide assistance to remote and rural locations across the globe by increasing health awareness, facilitating emergency medical training and donation of medical equipment. The DRF will also act as a trust and provide financial and logistical support to similar projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belarus
- Bhutan
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Chad
- Chile
- Costa Rica
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Ecuador
- Georgia
- Ghana
- Guatemala
- Haiti
- Honduras
- India
- Iran
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Macedonia
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mexico
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Nicaragua
- Nigeria
- Oman
- Panama
- Peru
- Philippines
- Romania
- Saudi Arabia
- Serbia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 20 August 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP BALLETT | Chair | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr AMIT DINESHKUMAR PATEL | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GERAINT REES | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|||||
OWAIN IAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.16k | £10 | £110 | £580 | £1.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.69k | £120 | £216 | £216 | £216 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 322 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 322 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE DAI REES FOUNDATION ARE: A) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SERVICES AND TRAINING TO IMPROVE WORLDWIDE LIFE-SUPPORT HEALTH CARE IN SUCH WAYS AND BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. B) TO SUPPORT THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE DONATION OF GRANTS, FUNDING AND MEDICAL EQUIPMENT TO ENABLE THE DELIVERY OF WORLDWIDE LIFE-SUPPORT HEALTHCARE SERVICES IN SUCH WAYS AND BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO RAISING AWARENESS, PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF LIFE-SUPPORT HEALTHCARE AND RELATED HEALTHCARE SUBJECTS IN SUCH WAYS AND BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Lime Kiln Road
Lytchett Matravers
POOLE
Dorset
BH16 6EL
- Phone:
- 07540797226
- Email:
- thedrfcharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window