LIFE LEISURE TRUST

Charity number: 1159092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Dwyer Trustee 16 March 2020 None on record
Stewart Healy Trustee 14 June 2021 None on record
LYN JAMES EVANS Trustee 12 May 2014 None on record
Stephen James Priestnall Trustee 27 January 2020 None on record
Richard Dando Trustee 26 March 2019 None on record
Wayne Hodgins Trustee 13 December 2018 None on record
DONNA HARDMAN Trustee 12 May 2014 None on record
Jennifer Ames Trustee 24 August 2017 None on record
Andrea Smart Trustee 27 January 2020 None on record