EARLY LIFE NUTRITION NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Early Life Nutrition network was created with the aim of improving nutrition in early life. It was launched with 300 healthcare stakeholders, discussing the problem of how to improve behaviors surrounding nutrition in early life. It is a virtual community whose activities include sharing best practice and working globally across disciplines to effect behaviour change in this field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Albania
- Algeria
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Bahrain
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Kenya
- Libya
- Lithuania
- Malaysia
- Mexico
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Oman
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Russia
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Singapore
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Thailand
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 17 March 2015: CIO registration
- 26 July 2021: Removed (Removed by application)
- 26 July 2021: Funds transferred to 1160373 THE POWER OF NUTRITION
- ELN NETWORK (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £508.68k | £48.63k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £276.63k | £207.36k | £57.25k | £7.81k | £2.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £508.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 April 2021 | 172 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 April 2021 | 172 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 16 March 2020 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 16 March 2020 | 137 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 12 June 2019 | 224 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2017
(These accounts |
12 June 2019 | 224 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: -IMPROVING KNOWLEDGE OF HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS TO HELP THEM CHANGE BEHAVIOURS IN THEIR PATIENTS AND THE GENERAL POPULATION IN ORDER TO IMPROVE GLOBAL HEALTH OUTCOMES. -IMPROVING NUTRITION IN EARLY LIFE BY BRINGING TOGETHER HEALTHCARE WORKERS FROM ACROSS THE WORLD AND ACROSS DISCIPLINES TO ALLOW BEST PRACTICES FROM ONE REGION OR DISCIPLINE TO BE USED ELSEWHERE BY POOLING RESOURCES, FUELLING DISCUSSION AND DISSEMINATING KNOWLEDGE. -IMPROVING THE STANDARD AND QUALITY OF CARE FOR THE LONG TERM HEALTH BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS’ KNOWLEDGE OF BEST PRACTICE, POSSIBLE INTERVENTIONS, AND BEHAVIOUR CHANGE INTERVENTIONS ACROSS THE GLOBE. -HELPING TO DELIVER BETTER PATIENT OUTCOMES AND THUS HAVE A POSITIVE INFLUENCE ON THE LONG TERM HEALTH OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC THROUGH KNOWLEDGE SHARING. -IMPROVING THE POPULATION’S GENERAL HEALTH IN THE LONG-TERM AND ALLEVIATING OVERBURDENED HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS BY ADOPTING KNOWLEDGE AND EVIDENCE BASED PRACTICE TO INFLUENCE NUTRITION IN EARLY LIFE POSITIVELY ACROSS A GLOBAL COMMUNITY. -IMPROVING THE POPULATION’S GENERAL HEALTH IN THE LONG TERM BY UNDERSTANDING THE BEST WAYS OF GETTING THE MESSAGE OUT AND CHANGING PEOPLE’S BEHAVIOUR BY BRINGING TOGETHER KEY OPINION LEADERS FROM ACROSS THE WORLD TO DISCUSS, AGREE AND IMPLEMENT PLANS OF ACTION.”.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window