THE CARIBBEAN MOVEMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1161474
Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 36 days
Accounts and TAR 22 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 36 days
Annual return 22 October 2019 07 April 2021 228 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 October 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 April 2021 228 days late Download
Annual return 22 October 2018 21 January 2020 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 October 2018 31 January 2020 162 days late Download
Annual return 22 October 2017 19 February 2019 181 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 October 2017 07 April 2021 959 days late Download
Annual return 22 October 2016 26 September 2017 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 October 2016 23 August 2017 1 days late Download