LINCOLN CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 505023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 09 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 15 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 30 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 24 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 24 May 2017 On time Download