LINCOLN CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 505023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £37.08k £26.46k £23.92k £67.06k £46.49k
Total expenditure £49.38k £28.28k £26.20k £67.48k £41.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A