THE PETER AND TERESA HARRIS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust's objects are namely charitable purposes for the public benefit as are exclusively charitable according to the Laws of England and Wales as the Trustees may from time to time determine. The policies adopted in furtherance of these objects are to make grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 April 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DUNCAN CHARLES PRINGLE RABAGLIATI | Chair | 07 April 2015 |
|
|||||
TIM BARNES QC | Trustee | 07 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.15k | £41.31k | £56.81k | £67.23k | £79.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.01k | £137.73k | £113.87k | £71.33k | £122.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 NOV 2010 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/04/2015
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Wool Road
Wimbledon
LONDON
SW20 0HW
- Phone:
- 02089461173
- Email:
- legal@rabagliati.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window