Financial history ST. CLEMENT'S GOSPEL TRUST

Charity number: 1159376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.76k £3.09k £11.13k £11.28k £11.79k
Total expenditure £60 £5.36k £11.89k £5.08k £15.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A