THE GILLULEY FOUNDATION - BLYTH HOUSE PROJECT

Charity number: 1159043
Charity reporting is overdue by 970 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 239 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 239 days
Annual return 01 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 605 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 605 days
Annual return 01 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 970 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 970 days
Annual return 01 April 2017 15 January 2020 713 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 15 January 2020 713 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2016 15 January 2020 1078 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 15 January 2020 1078 days late Download