FUTURE INCLUSIONS ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1159918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £15.11k £14.18k £12.99k £24.99k £51.70k
Total expenditure £13.91k £4.82k £20.70k £22.72k £29.28k
Income from government contracts £13.88k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.00k £3.50k N/A £10.00k