CHILD PROTECTION & REHABILITATION TRUST

Charity number: 1160070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £17.06k £58.57k £165.59k £121.42k £80.42k
Total expenditure £5.03k £24.48k £89.51k £82.41k £44.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A