Trustees ENGLAND GOLF TRUST

Charity number: 1160992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Moira Page Chair 06 June 2023
None on record
Jim Williamson Trustee 16 February 2023
None on record
Rob Drinkwater Trustee 16 February 2023
None on record
Alice Emily Lowe Trustee 21 June 2022
None on record
Hope Neild Trustee 21 June 2021
None on record
ALISTAIR EDWARD MONCUR BOOTH Trustee 15 June 2021
BIBLE READING FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
Christine Stephanie Owens Trustee 22 October 2020
FRIENDS OF NORFOLK COUNTY YOUTH ORCHESTRA
Overdue by 77 days