Accounts and annual returns GRACELAND FAMILY INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1161938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 March 2020 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required