THE SOMERSET AND DORSET RAILWAY TRUST LTD.

Charity number: 1158865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN YOUNG Chair 18 March 2014 None on record
Mark Stanistreet Trustee 01 May 2021 None on record
MARTIN JOHN RICE Trustee 21 April 2018 None on record
ROGER HARDINGHAM Trustee 22 April 2017 None on record
Roderick David William Ormston Trustee 18 June 2016 None on record
Dr Peter John Clement Trenchard Trustee 17 October 2014 None on record
ANTHONY NIGEL DAVIES Trustee 17 October 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS COLEHILL Received: On time