COLOGNE ROAD COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 1159949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 16 March 2017 On time Download