COLOGNE ROAD COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 1159949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTINE CORTEEN Trustee 10 April 2018
LONGMEAD COMMUNITY FARM LIMITED Received: On time
APRIL DAWN NEWELL Trustee 22 January 2018 None on record
RACHEL MARY PALMER Trustee 16 August 2017 None on record
Janet Amey Trustee 09 April 2019 None on record
maureen stokes Trustee 22 January 2018 None on record
PETER WHARF Trustee 12 August 2014 None on record