Accounts and annual returns THE HARRIS CLUB FOR THE DISABLED (SPEKE)

Charity number: 505058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required