Financial history THE HARRIS CLUB FOR THE DISABLED (SPEKE)

Charity number: 505058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.79k £9.20k £6.97k £1.47k £1.87k
Total expenditure £8.93k £9.20k £8.38k £2.63k £2.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A