Trustees TOTLEY COMMUNITY RESOURCE AND INFORMATION CENTRE
Charity number: 1158493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Brown | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin McLean | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna woodward | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Johnson | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carys Margaret Hamilton | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Lansdown | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julie Anne Kitlowski | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER JOHN LASKO | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cvetelin Vasilev | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Collette Duke | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.