MANOR GOSPEL TRUST

Charity number: 1160172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust provides and maintains gospel halls for the religious activities of Christians often referred to as 'Brethren'. Details of the origins, teachings and way of life of the Brethren can be found on their website - www.plymouthbrethrenchristianchurch.org. The main gospel hall is in Swanley, Kent

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2020

Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GARTH OLIVER WOODCOCK Trustee 18 September 2015
THE ALBACORE GOSPEL HALL TRUST Received: On time
Anthony George Hazell Trustee 18 September 2015 None on record
Dean Ellis Trustee 18 September 2015 None on record
Paul Adrian Brown Trustee 18 September 2015
HAWLEY GOSPEL TRUST Received: On time
Lee Darren Hazell Trustee 18 September 2015 None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £404.05k £3.61m £4.99m £2.06m £1.12m
Total expenditure £21.03k £351.53k £489.82k £979.82k £1.19m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £3.60m £4.96m £2.03m £1.10m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £9.05k £23.10k £26.90k £17.72k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £351.53k £185.00k £173.28k £331.66k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £13.71k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £7.50k £26.43k £18.00k £21.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £291.12k £806.54k £856.76k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Own use assets N/A £13.40m £22.11m £23.93m £23.80m
Long-term investments N/A £2 £2 £2 £2
Other assets N/A £3.73m £2.35m £807.47k £825.45k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £12.51m £15.34m £14.54m £14.50m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 08 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 06 February 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 06 February 2017 1 days late Download
Submit annual return

Contact information

Address:
The Brethrens Meeting Hall
Leydenhatch Lane
SWANLEY
Kent
BR8 7PS
Phone:
07584394653
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available