Accounts and annual returns ASYLUM SUPPORT AND IMMIGRATION RESOURCE TEAM

Charity number: 1159888
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 March 2024 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 March 2024 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 February 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 February 2023 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 February 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 February 2020 7 days late Download Open in new window