Financial history ASYLUM SUPPORT AND IMMIGRATION RESOURCE TEAM

Charity number: 1159888
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £143.79k £192.19k £303.06k £241.45k £323.23k
Total expenditure £115.35k £173.54k £230.10k £313.56k £335.73k
Income from government contracts N/A £50.34k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £42.43k £50.98k N/A £29.08k