ASYLUM SUPPORT AND IMMIGRATION RESOURCE TEAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer dedicated, comprehensive and free legal advice, representation and advocacy support to people subject to immigration control. We are a key support agency for people experiencing destitution and hardship. Our focus is on work with vulnerable families, and we have considerable expertise in this area. We also offer policy and strategic work; and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £29,079 from 2 government grant(s)
People
5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 12 January 2015: CIO registration
- 09 February 2021: Funds received from 1098544 ASYLUM SUPPORT & IMMIGRATION RESOURCE TEAM
- ASIRT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isata Kanneh | Chair | 12 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Diana Katoto | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Sanderson | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Saunders | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Evans | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.79k | £192.19k | £303.06k | £241.45k | £323.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.35k | £173.54k | £230.10k | £313.56k | £335.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £50.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £42.43k | £50.98k | N/A | £29.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 07 February 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 07 February 2020 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1)TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS, REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN BIRMINGHAM AND THE WEST MIDLANDS CONURBATION, WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING LEGAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO RELIEVE SUCH CONDITIONS; AND 2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, SPECIALIST ORGANISATIONS AND PERSONS SUBJECT TO UK IMMIGRATION CONTROL AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN ORDER TO PROMOTE ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT THE INCLUSION OF MIGRANTS, REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS INTO THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM AND THE WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 125785
Office 10
Izabella House
24-26 Regent Place
Birmingham
- Phone:
- 01212135893
- Email:
- admin@asirt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window