Financial history BUBBENHALL COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS

Charity number: 1159271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.06k £1.17k £787 £7 £1
Total expenditure £628 £683 £541 £239 £2.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A