THE WATLINGTON CLUB CIO

Charity number: 1160612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLES EALES Trustee 15 October 2020 None on record
Peter Brook Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
DAVE PARKES Chair 24 February 2015 None on record
Sarah Jane Fountain Trustee 10 December 2019 None on record
Peter Leslie Neal Trustee 21 May 2018 None on record
Christy Louise King Trustee 16 June 2020 None on record
GRAHAM SMITH Trustee 24 February 2015 None on record