CARDIFF GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity Number: 1159468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The preaching of the Christian gospel, The study of the Bible as the basis of all spiritual, moral and ethical teaching The provision of places where men, women and children can pray, especially in times of crisis and disaster. The provision of a base from which persons can go out to spread the Christian gospel and in their everyday lives be exponents of Christian values.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £322,489
Total expenditure: £281,374

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cardiff

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 December 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • HIRWAUN ROAD TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Barry George Thompson Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
ALEX MICHAEL NUNN Trustee 03 February 2018
None on record
Graham Davis Trustee 14 April 2015
None on record
GRANT HEWISON Trustee 10 January 2006
None on record
TIMOTHY GEORGE SWANSON Trustee 01 October 2003
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £135.26k £243.10k £178.26k £156.64k £322.49k
Total expenditure £71.16k £74.73k £170.43k £199.43k £281.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 22 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 22 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 04 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 04 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 11 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Hawthorns
St. Brides-Super-Ely
CARDIFF
CF5 6EY
Phone:
020 8391 7620
Website:

plymouthbrethrenchristianchurch.org